Leslie Edward Walker v. DITECH FINANCIAL LLC et al

Plaintiff: Leslie Edward Walker
Defendant: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC and Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv03084
Filed: June 6, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2017 73 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 72 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadline Re Initial Disclosures filed by DITECH FINANCIAL LLC, Elahe S Walker, Leslie Edward Walker, Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 1/10/17. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
November 16, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE RE: INITIAL DISCLOSURES re 51 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Deadline Re Initial Disclosures filed by DITECH FINANCIAL LLC, Elahe S Walker, Leslie Edward Walker, Residential Credit Solutions, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 11/15/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
October 6, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting 21 Motion to Dismiss; granting 26 Motion to Dismiss. (kawlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leslie Edward Walker v. DITECH FINANCIAL LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Edward Walker
Represented By: David L Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC
Represented By: Lindsey Elizabeth Kress
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica A. McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?