Dantzler v. City and County of San Francisco
Plaintiff: Eugene F. Dantzler
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Case Number: 3:2016cv03119
Filed: June 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 69 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2018)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 45 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2018)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 40 TO CONTINUE EXPERT DISCOVERY AND RE DEFENDANT'S PSYCHOLOGICAL EVALUATION OF PLAINTIFF AMENDED filed by City and County of San Francisco. Discovery due by 1/10/2018. Rebuttal Reports due by 1/29/2018. Expert Discovery Cut-Off by 2/12/2018. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/11/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order for Standard Litigation filed by City and County of San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/5/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 16 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and Related Dates filed by City and County of San Francisco Case Management Statement due by 1/5/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2017 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/5/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2016)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL re 4 Proposed Order filed by Eugene F. Dantzler. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/8/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dantzler v. City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene F. Dantzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?