Sentegra, LLC v. Asus Computer International

Plaintiff: Sentegra, LLC
Defendant: ASUS Computer International
Case Number: 3:2016cv03136
Filed: June 9, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2016 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 88 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AFTER EVIDENTIARY HEARING by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2016)
December 20, 2016 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE EVIDENTIARY HEARING RECORD. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/20/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
December 14, 2016 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 87 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2016)
December 12, 2016 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 102 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MICHAEL JAMES FAGAN, JR., PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2016)
November 14, 2016 97 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF EVIDENTIARY HEARING. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/14/2016. Evidentiary Hearing set for 12/14/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2016)
November 7, 2016 96 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/7/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
September 26, 2016 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATIONFOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ZACHARY SILBERSHER PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 89 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2016)
August 26, 2016 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO STAY CASE by Hon. William Alsup denying 82 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
August 18, 2016 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY DWAYNE C. NORTON PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 74 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2016)
August 17, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS OF ATTORNEY LI CHEN AND DWAYNE C. NORTON by Judge Alsup denying 70 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; denying 71 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sentegra, LLC v. Asus Computer International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sentegra, LLC
Represented By: Sergey Kolmykov
Represented By: Gaston Kroub
Represented By: Zachary D. Silbersher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASUS Computer International
Represented By: Li Chen
Represented By: Vinay Vijay Joshi, Esq.
Represented By: Dwayne C Norton
Represented By: Andrew M. St. Laurent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?