Erina Llamas v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Plaintiff: Erina Llamas
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 3:2016cv03293
Filed: June 14, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 5, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on July 5, 2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
June 7, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 MOTION to Continue Briefing Schedule. Dispositive motions heard by 8/23/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/07/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
March 31, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEADLINES ON CROSS MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT. Motions to be heard by 7/19/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 03/31/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erina Llamas v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erina Llamas
Represented By: Scott D. Kalkin, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?