Gina McLeod v. Bank of America, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Gina McLeod
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2016cv03294
Filed: June 14, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2018 54 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Further Case Management Conference filed by Bank of America, N.A. Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2018. Further Case Management Conference reset for 6/28/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/14/18. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
February 28, 2018 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 45 EXTENDING DEADLINE TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Gina McLeod. Case Management Statement due by 5/24/2018. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/31/2018 10:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/28/18. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
December 13, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen GRANTING 29 Motion to Certify Class. Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 1/11/2018. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
March 31, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 (Stipulated Protective Order) filed by Bank of America, N.A. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/31/17. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2017)
September 9, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS 18 . Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/9/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gina McLeod v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina McLeod
Represented By: Elizabeth R Gropman
Represented By: Aaron D. Kaufmann
Represented By: David Philip Pogrel
Represented By: Edward Joseph Wynne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Apalla U. Chopra
Represented By: Susannah Kelly Howard
Represented By: Adam P. KohSweeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?