E.D.C. Technologies, Inc. v. Seidel et al
Plaintiff: E.D.C. Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: Jim Seidel, Jason Pavlos, Fred Klinzmann, Seidel Associates, LLC and Greenbox Energy
Case Number: 3:2016cv03316
Filed: June 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 2/14/18. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY 91 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/21/2017)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying 55 Motion to Strike ; denying 55 Motion to Dismiss. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT PAVLOS'S MOTION TO DISMISS 37 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/25/2016)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ON SEIDEL MOTION TO DISMISS 18 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/1/2016)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT FRED KLINZMANN PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6-1(a) ENLARGING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/8/16. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E.D.C. Technologies, Inc. v. Seidel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.D.C. Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Michael William Stebbins
Represented By: Marc George VanNiekerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Seidel
Represented By: Gabriel Scott Spooner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Pavlos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Klinzmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seidel Associates, LLC
Represented By: Gabriel Scott Spooner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenbox Energy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?