Todd v. AT&T Corp. et al

Plaintiff: Cynthia Todd
Defendant: AT&T Corp., Equifax Information Services LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc
Case Number: 3:2016cv03357
Filed: June 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Nevada
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2017 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 81 Motion for Extension of Time to File Unopposed Stipulation of Dismissal. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
April 26, 2017 80 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL Re Docket No. 79 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/26/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2017)
April 19, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/19/2017. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
March 27, 2017 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 75 Stipulation EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE AND DEADLINE TO DISCLOSE REBUTTAL EXPERTS. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
March 23, 2017 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 73 Stipulation DISMISSAL OF EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
February 16, 2017 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 69 Stipulation Extending Time for Non-Expert Discovery. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017)
January 31, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 67 Stipulation Extending Time For Expert Designations. Designation of Experts due by 3/17/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
December 5, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 59 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Campbell, Norman. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2016)
November 29, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 60 Stipulation TO EXTEND ADR DEADLINE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
November 18, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 56 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Love, John. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2016)
November 2, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 53 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Wallace, Lucius. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
September 16, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 45 Stipulation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
September 9, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 35 Motion to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
September 7, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 28 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
September 1, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 25 Stipulation selecting Mediation. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todd v. AT&T Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Todd
Represented By: Balam Osberto Letona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?