Wilson, Jr. v. Muniz

Petitioner: Frederick Wilson, Jr.
Respondent: William L. Muniz
Case Number: 3:2016cv03366
Filed: June 16, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: PSLC JNE
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO INTERPLEAD AND FOR PROMISSORY NOTE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/25/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
February 10, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS re 2 filed by Frederick Wilson, Jr.. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/10/17. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017)
November 23, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE NOTICE OF ELECTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/23/2016. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson, Jr. v. Muniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frederick Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William L. Muniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?