McMillion et al v. Rash Curtis & Associates

Plaintiff: Sandra McMillion, Jessica Adekoya and Ignacio Perez
Defendant: Rash Curtis & Associates
Case Number: 3:2016cv03396
Filed: June 17, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 21, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 4/21/2017. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2017)
April 18, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 33 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2017)
February 24, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR STANDARD LITIGATION [AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT]. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/24/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
November 30, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 16-cv-5807-VC, Kante v. Rash Curtis & Associates. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 11/30/2016. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMillion et al v. Rash Curtis & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra McMillion
Represented By: .L Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Yeremey O. Krivoshey
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Adekoya
Represented By: .L Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Yeremey O. Krivoshey
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ignacio Perez
Represented By: .L Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Yeremey O. Krivoshey
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rash Curtis & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?