AFT Local 2121 et al v. Accrediting Commission for Community and Junior Colleges

Plaintiff: AFT Local 2121, Palomar Faculty Federation, AFT Local 6161, Mendocino College Federation of Teachers, AFT Local 6322, San Jose-Evergreen Federation of Teachers, AFT Local 6157, Alisa Messer, Tim Killikelly, Karen Saginor, Shannon Lienhart, Shanell Williams, Augusta Goldstein and California Federation of Teachers
Defendant: Accrediting Commission for Community and Junior Colleges
Case Number: 3:2016cv03411
Filed: June 17, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2017 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 116 Stipulation for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims Against ACCJC Pursuant to Settlement Agreement. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
April 21, 2017 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 105 Stipulation Regarding Case Schedule. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2017)
February 24, 2017 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding 88 2/15/17 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 2/24/2017. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
January 26, 2017 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 86 Stipulation REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017)
January 11, 2017 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Docket Nos. 77 , 81 . Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/11/2017. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
January 10, 2017 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 82 Stipulation REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE. Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2017; Close of Fact Discovery due by 9/13/2017; Designation of Experts due by 9/13/2017; Close of Expert Discovery d ue by 10/25/2017; Rebuttal Reports due by 9/25/2017; Motions due by 11/1/2017.; Response is due 11/17/2017; Rely is due 11/30/2017; Motion Hearing set for 4/13/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/20/2018 03:00 PM; Jury Selection / Jury Trial set for 3/5/2018 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
November 10, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 59 Stipulation Regarding Enlargement of Briefs on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
September 30, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 47 Stipulation REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE AND REQUESTING TO ADVANCE HEARING DATE ON 38 PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND.. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
July 19, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 20 Stipulation REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
July 1, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 17 Stipulation REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AFT Local 2121 et al v. Accrediting Commission for Community and Junior Colleges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFT Local 2121
Represented By: Stephen P. Berzon
Represented By: Robert James Bezemek
Represented By: David Matthew Conway
Represented By: Eileen Goldsmith
Represented By: Meredith Anne Johnson
Represented By: Patricia Lim
Represented By: Peder J. Thoreen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palomar Faculty Federation
Represented By: Stephen P. Berzon
Represented By: Robert James Bezemek
Represented By: David Matthew Conway
Represented By: Eileen Goldsmith
Represented By: Meredith Anne Johnson
Represented By: Patricia Lim
Represented By: Peder J. Thoreen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFT Local 6161
Represented By: Stephen P. Berzon
Represented By: Eileen Goldsmith
Represented By: Meredith Anne Johnson
Represented By: Peder J. Thoreen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mendocino College Federation of Teachers
Represented By: Stephen P. Berzon
Represented By: Robert James Bezemek
Represented By: David Matthew Conway
Represented By: Eileen Goldsmith
Represented By: Meredith Anne Johnson
Represented By: Patricia Lim
Represented By: Peder J. Thoreen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFT Local 6322
Represented By: Stephen P. Berzon
Represented By: Eileen Goldsmith
Represented By: Meredith Anne Johnson
Represented By: Peder J. Thoreen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Jose-Evergreen Federation of Teachers
Represented By: Stephen P. Berzon
Represented By: Robert James Bezemek
Represented By: David Matthew Conway
Represented By: Eileen Goldsmith
Represented By: Meredith Anne Johnson
Represented By: Patricia Lim
Represented By: Peder J. Thoreen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFT Local 6157
Represented By: Stephen P. Berzon
Represented By: Eileen Goldsmith
Represented By: Meredith Anne Johnson
Represented By: Peder J. Thoreen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisa Messer
Represented By: Stephen P. Berzon
Represented By: Robert James Bezemek
Represented By: David Matthew Conway
Represented By: Eileen Goldsmith
Represented By: Meredith Anne Johnson
Represented By: Patricia Lim
Represented By: Peder J. Thoreen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Killikelly
Represented By: Stephen P. Berzon
Represented By: Robert James Bezemek
Represented By: David Matthew Conway
Represented By: Eileen Goldsmith
Represented By: Meredith Anne Johnson
Represented By: Patricia Lim
Represented By: Peder J. Thoreen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Saginor
Represented By: Stephen P. Berzon
Represented By: Robert James Bezemek
Represented By: David Matthew Conway
Represented By: Eileen Goldsmith
Represented By: Meredith Anne Johnson
Represented By: Patricia Lim
Represented By: Peder J. Thoreen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Lienhart
Represented By: Stephen P. Berzon
Represented By: Robert James Bezemek
Represented By: David Matthew Conway
Represented By: Eileen Goldsmith
Represented By: Meredith Anne Johnson
Represented By: Patricia Lim
Represented By: Peder J. Thoreen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanell Williams
Represented By: Stephen P. Berzon
Represented By: Robert James Bezemek
Represented By: David Matthew Conway
Represented By: Eileen Goldsmith
Represented By: Meredith Anne Johnson
Represented By: Patricia Lim
Represented By: Peder J. Thoreen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Augusta Goldstein
Represented By: Stephen P. Berzon
Represented By: Robert James Bezemek
Represented By: David Matthew Conway
Represented By: Eileen Goldsmith
Represented By: Meredith Anne Johnson
Represented By: Patricia Lim
Represented By: Peder J. Thoreen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Federation of Teachers
Represented By: Stephen P. Berzon
Represented By: Robert James Bezemek
Represented By: David Matthew Conway
Represented By: Eileen Goldsmith
Represented By: Meredith Anne Johnson
Represented By: Patricia Lim
Represented By: Peder J. Thoreen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accrediting Commission for Community and Junior Colleges
Represented By: Kenneth E. Keller
Represented By: Laurence Walter Kessenick
Represented By: Scott Cameron Kessenick
Represented By: Jennifer Robin McGlone
Represented By: Thomas Harlan Sloan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?