Rick Mladinich v. Safeguard Properties, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Rick Mladinich
Defendant: Safeguard Properties, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv03414
Filed: June 17, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/12/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2016)
September 8, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/8/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2016)
June 27, 2016 5 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/27/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rick Mladinich v. Safeguard Properties, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Mladinich
Represented By: Robert Stephen Arns
Represented By: Jonathan Ellsworth Davis
Represented By: Robert C. Foss
Represented By: Kevin M. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeguard Properties, LLC
Represented By: Margaret Rosenthal
Represented By: Sabrina Layne Shadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?