craigslist, Inc. v. EveryMD.com LLC

Plaintiff: craigslist, Inc.
Defendant: EveryMD.com LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv03421
Filed: June 17, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 3, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 50 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT filed by craigslist, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/3/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
January 27, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 Extending Time to File Joint Claim Construction Statement filed by craigslist, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/27/17. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2017)
January 12, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 40 Defendant's Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
August 23, 2016 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 25 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: craigslist, Inc. v. EveryMD.com LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: craigslist, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley A Hyde
Represented By: Ryan Rodney Owens
Represented By: Perry Joseph Viscounty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EveryMD.com LLC
Represented By: Frank Michael Weyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?