Perasso v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Patricia Perasso
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company and Group Long Term Disability Plan for employees of MWH Americas Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv03422
Filed: June 17, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL (pursuant to 32 stipulation) by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2016)
November 17, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE (pursuant to 30 stipulation). Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/17/2016. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/12/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Bench Trial set for 1/23/2017 07:30 AM before Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
October 7, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS by Hon. William Alsup granting 20 Stipulation selecting Mediation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
September 2, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 18 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perasso v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Perasso
Represented By: Margaret Elizabeth Hasselman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Long Term Disability Plan for employees of MWH Americas Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?