Sullivan v. Ford Motor Company et al

Plaintiff: Michael Sullivan
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and Thieman Tailgates, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv03505
Filed: June 23, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 2, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 50 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Filing Second Amended Complaint filed by Michael Sullivan. Amended Pleadings due by 3/6/2017. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 2, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2017)
December 28, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CORRECT THE EXPERT DISCLOSURE DEADLINE TO SEPTEMBER 13, 2017 re 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Michael Sullivan. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 28, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2016)
November 3, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting 24 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
August 12, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Initial Case Management Conference and to Extend Time for Defendant Ford Motor Company to Respond to First Amended Complaint filed by Ford Motor Company. Case Management Statement due by 10/31/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 12, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sullivan
Represented By: John Robert Bobay
Represented By: Michael Joseph Plocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Joan Alexis Rabutaso Camagong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thieman Tailgates, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Lynn Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?