Angus v. John Crane Inc.

Plaintiff: Angus, James Angus and Juana Angus
Defendant: John Crane Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv03532
Filed: June 23, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
0 Judge: Donna M Ryu
1 Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 12, 2016 25 Featured Case ORDER RE: ATTORNEYS' FEES re #24 Stipulation filed by James Angus. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 9, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2016)
September 7, 2016 24 STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF ORDER AWARDING FEES ATTORNEYS' FEES filed by James Angus. (Grant, Richard) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
August 29, 2016 23 Acknowledgment of Receipt of certified copy of remand order and docket entries from Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. (tnS) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
August 23, 2016 22 certified copy of remand order and certified copy of docket entries mailed to the Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Francisco. (tnS) (Filed on 8/23/2016)
August 22, 2016 21 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMAND by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #15 Motion to Remand. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2016)
August 19, 2016 20 NOTICE Pursuant to District Court Local Rule 7-13 filed by James Angus re #16 Opposition/Response to Motion, re #17 Reply to Opposition/Response, re #18 Declaration in Support, re #19 Order, re #15 MOTION to Remand Case to San Francisco County Superior Court (Grant, Richard) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
July 25, 2016 19 Featured Case ORDER VACATING HEARING re #15 MOTION to Remand Case to San Francisco County Superior Court filed by James Angus. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 25, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
July 25, 2016 18 Declaration of David R. Donadio in Support of #17 Reply to Opposition/Response to Motion to Remand Case to California Superior Court filed by James Angus. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Grant, Richard) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
July 21, 2016 17 REPLY (re #15 MOTION to Remand Case to San Francisco County Superior Court); -Reply to Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by James Angus, Juana Angus. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Grant, Richard) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 14, 2016 16 RESPONSE to (re #15 MOTION to Remand Case to San Francisco County Superior Court); -Defendant John Crane Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand Case to San Francisco County Superior Court filed by John Crane Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Taheri, Alex) (Filed on 7/14/2016)
June 30, 2016 15 MOTION to Remand Case to San Francisco County Superior Court filed by James Angus. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 7/14/2016. Replies due by 7/21/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Grant, Richard) (Filed on 6/30/2016)
June 29, 2016 14 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
June 28, 2016 13 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on June 28, 2016. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
June 27, 2016 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 27, 2016 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by James Angus.. (Grant, Richard) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 24, 2016 10 NOTICE by John Crane Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, NOTICE TO FEDERAL COURT OF NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS AND STATE COURT OF REMOVAL OF ACTION (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Taheri, Alex) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
June 24, 2016 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2016. Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2016 01:30 PM. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
June 24, 2016 8 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 7/8/2016. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
June 24, 2016 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Crane Inc. re #3 Jury Demand, #5 Notice (Other),,,,, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #1 Notice of Removal,, #4 Certificate of Interested Entities AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Taheri, Alex) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
June 23, 2016 Answer to Removal Complaint re #5 by John Crane Inc.. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 23, 2016 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Crane Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Taheri, Alex) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 23, 2016 5 NOTICE filed by John Crane Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit Exhibit GG, #34 Exhibit Exhibit HH, #35 Exhibit Exhibit II, #36 Exhibit Exhibit JJ, #37 Exhibit Exhibit KK, #38 Exhibit Exhibit LL, #39 Exhibit Exhibit MM, #40 Exhibit Exhibit NN, #41 Exhibit Exhibit OO, #42 Exhibit Exhibit PP, #43 Exhibit Exhibit QQ, #44 Exhibit Exhibit RR, #45 Exhibit Exhibit SS, #46 Exhibit Exhibit TT, #47 Exhibit Exhibit UU, #48 Exhibit Exhibit VV, #49 Exhibit Exhibit WW, #50 Exhibit Exhibit XX, #51 Exhibit Exhibit YY, #52 Exhibit Exhibit ZZ, #53 Exhibit Exhibit AAA)(Taheri, Alex) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 23, 2016 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by John Crane Inc. (Taheri, Alex) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 23, 2016 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by John Crane Inc.. (Taheri, Alex) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 23, 2016 2 Civil Cover Sheet by John Crane Inc. . (Taheri, Alex) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 23, 2016 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-14-276282, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-10554989). Filed by John Crane Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O)(Taheri, Alex) (Filed on 6/23/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angus v. John Crane Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Inc.
Represented By: Claire Christine Weglarz
Represented By: Bill D. Fountain
Represented By: Alex G. Taheri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Angus
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Represented By: Richard Martin Grant
Represented By: Nancy Teresa Williams
Represented By: Alan R. Brayton
Represented By: James Patrick Nevin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juana Angus
Represented By: David R. Donadio
Represented By: Richard Martin Grant
Represented By: Nancy Teresa Williams
Represented By: Alan R. Brayton
Represented By: James Patrick Nevin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?