American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California v. Burwell et al

Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California
Defendant: Sylvia Mathews Burwell, Mark Greenberg and Robert Carey
Case Number: 3:2016cv03539
Filed: June 24, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2017 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 82 Motion to Amend/Correct; finding as moot 83 Motion to Certify Class; denying 84 Motion for TRO; granting 96 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief.In the attached order, the court denies the motion for leave to amend an d denies the motion for a TRO without prejudice to Jane Doe's asserting it in a different lawsuit. This disposes of ECF Nos. 82 and 84. The court denies the motion for class certification at ECF No. 83 as moot. The court grants the motion at ECF No. 96 for leave to file an amicus brief. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
April 28, 2017 76 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler denying 62 Motion to Transfer Case. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2017)
March 17, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Hearing and Permitting Telephonic Participation. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 62 MOTION to Transfer Case to the District Court for the District of Columbia. Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference res et for 4/20/2017 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Case Management Statement due by 4/13/2017. Counsel to make arrangements through Courtcall (1-866-582-6878). Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/17/2017(rxmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
February 7, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 29 Motion to Intervene. The court grants USCCB's motion for permissive intervention. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017)
November 29, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court Order denying 20 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction entered by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. The attached order denies the motion to dismiss and finds that the ACLU has taxpayer standing. The court also sets an initial case-mana gement conference for 12/15/2016 at 11 a.m. The parties previously stipulated that their schedule would resume within three weeks of the court's order. (See ECF No. 18 at 2). The schedule includes their initial conference regarding discov ery and ADR, the Rule 26(f) report, and the initial case-management conference. (See id.) Given that the case is not calendared now, the court sets the initial case-management conference. The parties may change that date by stipulation to any Thursday at 11 a.m. The parties must confer by 12/1/2016 and submit any case-management statement or stipulation by 12/8/2016.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California v. Burwell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California
Represented By: Brigitte Amiri
Represented By: Jennifer Ling Chou
Represented By: Elizabeth O. Gill
Represented By: Melissa Allison Goodman
Represented By: Brian M Hauss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia Mathews Burwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?