NORMAN V. STRATEMAN

Plaintiff: Donald Norman
Defendant: Intersango, LLC, Patrick Strateman, Jamie Strateman, Amir Taaki and Intersango Limited Liability Corporation
Case Number: 3:2016cv03587
Filed: June 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 36 Motion to Dismiss; granting 37 Motion to Dismiss. Court DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE the entire action. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2016)
November 21, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Friday, 12/2/2016 02:00 PM. Plaintiff Show Cause Response due by 11/25/2016. The Court VACATES the hearing on defendants' motions to dismiss currently set for ** November 29, 2016,** to be reset if briefing on such motions is complete. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/21/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
October 31, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [*AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT*]; re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference [ECF No. 30] filed by Intersango, LLC, Donald Norman, Patrick Strateman. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2016 is CONTINUED to Monday, 1/9/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/31/16. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2016)
September 27, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 23 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NORMAN V. STRATEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intersango, LLC
Represented By: Louis Harrison Castoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Strateman
Represented By: Ellen Peitse Liu
Represented By: Gilda R. Turitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Strateman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amir Taaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intersango Limited Liability Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Norman
Represented By: Nathaniel G Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?