Moody v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Yolanda Evette Moody
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 3:2016cv03646
Filed: June 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 22 Motion for Attorney Fees. (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 15 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 16 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moody v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Marcelo N Illarmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Evette Moody
Represented By: Katherine Rose Siegfried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?