Run Them Sweet, LLC v. CPA Global Limited et al

Plaintiff: Run Them Sweet, LLC
Defendant: CPA Global Limited and CPA Global North America, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv03662
Filed: June 29, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting 20 Motion to Transfer Case. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2016)
September 28, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by CPA Global Limited, CPA Global North America, LLC. Case Management Statement due by 12/27/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/4/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 28, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
August 24, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule on Defendants Motion to Transfer and Extension of Time to Respond to Initial Complaint filed by CPA Global Limited, CPA Global North America, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 24, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Run Them Sweet, LLC v. CPA Global Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Run Them Sweet, LLC
Represented By: Rowennakete Paul Barnes
Represented By: Ethan Joseph Brown
Represented By: Adam R. Gonnelli
Represented By: Geoffrey Alex Neri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPA Global Limited
Represented By: Penelope Athene Preovolos
Represented By: Grant C Schrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPA Global North America, LLC
Represented By: Penelope Athene Preovolos
Represented By: Grant C Schrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?