Cynthia Marie Vespa v. Singler-Ernster Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Cynthia Marie Vespa
Defendant: Singler-Ernster Inc., Peter Anthony Singler, Jr., Carol Susanne Singler and Singler-Ernster, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Trust
Case Number: 3:2016cv03723
Filed: July 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 5, 2017 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 52 Motion to Dismiss; denying 53 Motion to Dismiss. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
November 8, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 28 Motion to Dismiss, with leave to amend.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2016)
October 3, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Motion Schedule, Hearing, and Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/3/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
July 11, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/11/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cynthia Marie Vespa v. Singler-Ernster Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singler-Ernster Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Anthony Singler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Susanne Singler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Singler-Ernster, Inc. Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Marie Vespa
Represented By: David Richard Johanson
Represented By: Rebecca Dunlevy Takacs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?