Porter-Burns v. Arrowood Indemnity Company, et al
Plaintiff: Arthelle Porter-Burns
Defendant: Arrowpoint Capital, Nelson & Kennard, Robert Scott Kennard, Jamie Allison Forbes and Arrowood Indemnity Company
Case Number: 3:2016cv03756
Filed: July 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STANDBY ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/18/2017 at 01:30 PM. Show Cause Response due by 5/11/2017. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/27/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend the Date to Complete the Early Neutral Evaluation Hearing. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/10/17. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2017)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/24/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter-Burns v. Arrowood Indemnity Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrowpoint Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson & Kennard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Scott Kennard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Allison Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrowood Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthelle Porter-Burns
Represented By: James Anthony Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?