Mazzitti v. March of Dimes Foundation
Plaintiff: Marguerite Mazzitti
Defendant: March of Dimes Foundation
Case Number: 3:2016cv03781
Filed: July 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Dismissal of Entire Action With Prejudice filed by March of Dimes Foundation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 4, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 Stipulation Withdrawing Discovery Dispute Regarding March of Dimes' Subpoenas filed by March of Dimes Foundation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 17, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 16 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by March of Dimes Foundation filed by March of Dimes Foundation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 4, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/15/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mazzitti v. March of Dimes Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marguerite Mazzitti
Represented By: Sean Desmond McHenry
Represented By: Aaron Paul Minnis
Represented By: Sonya Lisa Smallets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: March of Dimes Foundation
Represented By: Danielle L. Ochs
Represented By: Zachary W Shine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?