Freeman v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Neva B. Freeman
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Wells Fargo Home Mortgage, Wells Fargo Home Lending and Quality Loan Service Corporation
Case Number: 3:2016cv03790
Filed: July 6, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 21 Motion to Remand. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
August 8, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RE [#30] RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/8/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
August 2, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 28 STIPULATION RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTIONS SET FOR HEARING ON SEPTEMBER 8, 2016. Motions Hearing set for 9/8/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg.Responses due by 8/18/2016. Replies due by 8/25/2016. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/2/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
July 28, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE re 26 Order. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/28/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2016)
July 20, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER ON MOTION AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/20/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2016)
July 15, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/15/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neva B. Freeman
Represented By: Peter Collins Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Lending
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Bryan Learned
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?