Nelson et al v. Levy et al

Plaintiff: Leslee A. Nelson and Nancy Barth
Defendant: Rayah Levy, Jessica Jacobson and Rayah Rachel Levy International
Case Number: 3:2016cv03797
Filed: July 6, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 30, 2017 108 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/30/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 23, 2017 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/23/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2017)
April 3, 2017 98 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 4/3/2017. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
March 8, 2017 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST. All parties shall attend telephonically the Case Management Conference scheduled for March 24, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 03/08/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2017)
February 24, 2017 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 02/24/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
January 9, 2017 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION. The hearing on the two pending motions to dismiss and the pending motion for preliminary injunction are all continued to February 17, 2017, at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiffs shall file their oppositions to the two motions to dismiss no later than January 20, 2017. Defendants shall file their oppositions to the motion for preliminary injunction no later than January 20, 2017. Any replies shall be filed no later than February 3, 2017. The status conference is continued from February 17, 2017, to March 24, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 01/09/17. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2017)
December 6, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER PURSUANT TO STIPULATION. The hearing on plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction is continued to January 27, 2017. Any opposition to said motion is due no later than January 6, 2017. Any reply is due no later than January 13 , 2017. The hearing on any motion to dismiss any amended complaint filed by plaintiffs shall be heard on January 27, 2017. The initial case management conference remains set for February 17, 2017. The joint case management statement remains due no later than February 10, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/6/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
November 23, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT JESSICA JACOBSON'S MOTION TO DISMISS; AFFORDING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO AMEND; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Should plaintiffs wish to file a second amended complaint, plaintiffs shall file it no later than December 9, 2016. The case management conference is continued to February 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/23/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
October 24, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES OF DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/24/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
October 13, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANT JESSICA JACOBSON'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE AMENDED COMPLAINT. The hearing scheduled for October 21, 2016 is vacated. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/13/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
October 11, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPES OF DOCUMENTS IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/11/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
October 6, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The case management conference is continued to December 9, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. The parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement no later than December 2, 2016. If the parties wish to appear telephonically at the case management conference, they shall file a request with the Court no later than December 2, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 10/06/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
September 7, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY OF AMENDED COMPLAINT IN COMPLIANCE WITH CIVIL LOCAL RULES AND THE COURT'S STANDING ORDERS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 09/07/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
August 24, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW "MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS" AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 24, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2016)
August 22, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO FILE OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS AND ORDER. 1. Plaintiffs will have until August 29, 2016 to file their opposition to Jacobson's Motion to Dismiss. Defendant will have until September 12, 2016 to file a Reply. 2. The hearing on the motion to dismiss is continued to September 30, 2016, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 22, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2016)
August 19, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFENDANT JESSICA JACOBSON'S NOTICE OF CONTINUING THE MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6) OR FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT UNDER F.R.C.P. 12(E); ORDER THEREON. The motion to dismiss is continued to September 23, 2016, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 19, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
August 9, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANT JESSICA JACOBSON'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT. The hearing date for defendant's "Motion to Dismiss Under F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) or for a More Definite Statement Under F.R.C.P. 12(e)," filed August 8, 2016, is continued from September 9, 2016, to September 16, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 9, 2016. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2016).
August 4, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO UNSEAL SEALED DOCUMENTS. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to unseal all documents that have been filed under seal to date. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 4, 2016. (mmclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson et al v. Levy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslee A. Nelson
Represented By: Abraham M. George
Represented By: D. Gill Sperlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Barth
Represented By: Abraham M. George
Represented By: D. Gill Sperlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rayah Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Jacobson
Represented By: Mark Andrew Pruner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rayah Rachel Levy International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?