Mackall v. Healthsource Global Staffing, Inc.

Plaintiff: Karen Mackall
Defendant: Healthsource Global Staffing, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv03810
Filed: July 7, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE JURISDICTION FOR PRELIMINARY OR FINAL APPROVAL. Show Cause Response due 10/18/2017 by 10:00 AM. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/18/2017 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on October 13, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
November 1, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 8 MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION by Hon. William H. Orrick. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
September 30, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND 8 MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION HEARING TO OCTOBER 26, 2016. Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/30/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 2, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REMAND by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 15 Motion to Remand. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mackall v. Healthsource Global Staffing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Mackall
Represented By: Treana Louise Allen
Represented By: Kevin Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthsource Global Staffing, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Samuel Fong
Represented By: Thomas Roy Kaufman
Represented By: Adam Ryan Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?