Mysfyt, Inc. v. James Lum

Plaintiff: Mysfyt, Inc.
Defendant: James Lum
Case Number: 3:2016cv03813
Filed: July 7, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 . STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Proceedings Pending Settlement filed by MYSFYT, Inc., James Lum. Case Management Statement due by 11/14/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/12/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
July 26, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Proceedings Pending Settlement filed by MYSFYT, Inc., James Lum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/26/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2017)
June 20, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS re 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Pending Settlement filed by MYSFYT, Inc., James Lum. Case Management Statement due by 7/25/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2017 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 6/20/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
May 19, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CMC re 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Pending Settlement filed by MYSFYT, Inc., James Lum Case Management Statement due by 6/20/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2017 01:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 5/19/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
April 6, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STAY PENDING SETTLEMENT re 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Pending Settlement filed by MYSFYT, Inc., James Lum Case Management Statement due by 5/16/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 4/6/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2017)
December 13, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS re 27 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by James Lum filed by MYSFYT, Inc., James Lum, Case referred to mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 12/13/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2016)
November 29, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying Defendant's 17 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Defendant shall file an answer within 21 days of this order. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
October 7, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE CLERK'S DEFAULT AND EXTEND re 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 13 Clerk's Notice of Entry of Default Stipulation to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default filed by MYSFYT, Inc., James Lum Case Management Statement due by 12/2/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 10/7/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mysfyt, Inc. v. James Lum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mysfyt, Inc.
Represented By: Dominic Vincent Signorotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Lum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?