Kung v. Citibank, National Association

Plaintiff: Kin Wah Kung
Defendant: Citibank, National Association
Case Number: 3:2016cv03814
Filed: July 7, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/3/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2016)
September 28, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST REGARDING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/28/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
August 31, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 16 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Case Management Statement due by 9/22/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/31/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
August 5, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE, Motions terminated: 10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Citibank, National Association.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/5/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
August 4, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR RESPONSE RE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/4/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
July 25, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. William Alsup granting 3 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kung v. Citibank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kin Wah Kung
Represented By: Kin Wah Kung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, National Association
Represented By: Robert Travis Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?