Shroeder v. YRC Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jerald Shroeder
Defendant: YRC Inc. and YRC Worldwide, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv03815
Filed: July 7, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON THE PARTIES JOINT STIPULATION TO TRANSFER ACTION by Hon. William Alsup granting 25 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
August 4, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON THE PARTIES JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE FILING DATES RELATED TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS,STAY OR TRANSFER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 9 Responses due by 8/15/2016. Replies due by 8/22/2016 AT NOON.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/4/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
August 1, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 21 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
July 25, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON THE PARTIES' JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE FILING DATES RELATED TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, STAY, OR TRANSFER by Hon. William Alsup granting 19 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
July 13, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/13/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shroeder v. YRC Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerald Shroeder
Represented By: David Thomas Mara
Represented By: William David Turley
Represented By: Jill Marie Vecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Inc.
Represented By: Ellen Marie Bronchetti
Represented By: Alexandra Howard Hemenway
Represented By: Ronald John Holland, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Ellen Marie Bronchetti
Represented By: Alexandra Howard Hemenway
Represented By: Ronald John Holland, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?