Gullory v. HSBC Bank, USA et al

Plaintiff: Felix O. Guillory
Defendant: HSBC Bank, USA and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Case Number: 3:2016cv03868
Filed: July 11, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT WITH CONDITIONS. The Court shall retain jurisdiction to rule on any motion for attorney's fees and/or application for costs. The motion for attorney's fees and/or application for costs must be filed within 14 days of the Court's approval of the parties' stipulation. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 19, 2017. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 8, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Tesfaye W. Tsadik is substituted as counsel in place of Felix Oliver Guillory. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 8, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2016)
August 10, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CHANGE TIME. Defendants shall cause the trustee's sale to be postponed to October 26, 2016, or later. The preliminary injunction hearing currently scheduled for August 19, 2016, and the parties' accompanying briefing schedule, is vacated. The parties shall appear for a status conference on October 7, 2016, at 10:30 a.m. A Status Conference Statement shall be filed no later than September 30, 2016. Defendants' response deadline to the complaint is continued until October 14, 2016. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 10, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2016)
July 21, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; SETTING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANTS; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. No later than Monday, August 1, 2016, plaintiff shall serve upon defendants the comp laint and summons, as well as a copy of plaintiff's motion filed July 11, 2016, plaintiff's reply filed July 19, 2016, the Court's order filed July 12, 2016, and the instant order. No later than Wednesday, August 3, 2016, plaintiff sha ll file with the Clerk of Court proof of such service. No later than Wednesday, August 3, 2016, plaintiff may file a supplement to his motion for a preliminary injunction. No later than Thursday, August 11, 2016, defendants shall file opposition or other response to plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction. No later than Tuesday, August 16, 2016, by 4:00 p.m., plaintiff shall file any reply. The hearing is continued to Friday, August 19, 2016, at 9:00 a.m., Courtroom 7. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 21, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 12, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND REQUEST FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Defendants are ordered to show cause, on July 21, 2016, at 10:00 a.m., in Cour troom 7, why an order should not be entered granting plaintiff a preliminary injunction enjoining defendants and their agents from foreclosing upon and selling the property located at 4909 Stacy Street, Oakland, California, 94605. Defendants shall fi le and serve any opposition no later than 5:00 p.m., Friday, July 15, 2016, and plaintiff shall file and serve any reply no later than noon, Tuesday, July 19, 2016. Pending the July 21, 2016 hearing, defendants and their agents are temporarily restra ined from foreclosing upon and selling the property located at 4909 Stacy Street, Oakland, California, 94605. The temporary restraining order is conditioned upon plaintiff's filing with the Clerk of Court, no later than Tuesday, July 19, 2016, a bond or other security, or cash, in the amount of $1,000. Plaintiff is directed to serve defendants' counsel with a copy of this order no later than 10:00 a.m., Wednesday, July 13, 2016, and to file proof of such service, no later than Thursday, July 14, 2016. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar for Maxine M. Chesney on July 12, 2016. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2016)
July 11, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/8/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gullory v. HSBC Bank, USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix O. Guillory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank, USA
Represented By: Elizabeth Holt Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Elizabeth Holt Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?