Lighting Science Group Corporation v. Shenzhen Jiawei Photovoltaic Lighting Co., Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Lighting Science Group Corporation
Defendant: Shenzhen Jiawei Photovoltaic Lighting Co., Ltd. and Jiawei Technology (USA), Limited
Case Number: 3:2016cv03886
Filed: July 11, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2017 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 82 DEFENDANTS' STIPULATION TO BE BOUND AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING INTER PARTES REVIEW. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/27/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
June 19, 2017 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 71 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY PENDING INTER PARTES REVIEW. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/19/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
June 16, 2017 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 78 DEFENDANTS SHENZHEN JIAWEI PHOTOVOLTAIC LIGHTING CO., LTD., AND JIAWEI TECHNOLOGY (USA), LIMITED'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/16/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lighting Science Group Corporation v. Shenzhen Jiawei Photovoltaic Lighting Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lighting Science Group Corporation
Represented By: Kimberly A. Donovan
Represented By: Brenna Anatone Force
Represented By: Jeffrey Keating Techentin
Represented By: Valerie Margo Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shenzhen Jiawei Photovoltaic Lighting Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jiawei Technology (USA), Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?