Operating Engineers' Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al

Plaintiff: Operating Engineers' Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Pensioned Operating Engineers' Health and Welfare Trust Fund, Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice and Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Russell E. Burns, Richard Piombo, Heavy and Highway Committee and Operating Engineers Local 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO
Defendant: JBR Partners, Inc. and James Albert Bryant
Case Number: 3:2016cv03888
Filed: July 11, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL (pursuant to 28 stipulation) by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2017)
December 20, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CALENDAR (pursuant to 26 stipulation). Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/20/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2016)
August 1, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 12 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Operating Engineers' Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers' Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Erica Jane Russell
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers
Represented By: Erica Jane Russell
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pensioned Operating Engineers' Health and Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Erica Jane Russell
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers and Participating Employers Pre-Apprentice, Apprentice and Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund
Represented By: Erica Jane Russell
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell E. Burns
Represented By: Erica Jane Russell
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Piombo
Represented By: Erica Jane Russell
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heavy and Highway Committee
Represented By: Erica Jane Russell
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Erica Jane Russell
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBR Partners, Inc.
Represented By: James A Bryant, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Albert Bryant
Represented By: James A Bryant, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?