Aparicio v. Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC

Plaintiff: Jorge F Aparicio
Defendant: Comcast, Inc., Comcast Holdings Corporation, Comcast Corporation and Comcast Cable Communications LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv03952
Filed: July 13, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 11, 2017 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART AND DENYING-IN-PART MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion for Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2017)
March 1, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/1/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2017)
December 15, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending ADR Deadline filed by Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 16, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aparicio v. Comcast Cable Communications Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge F Aparicio
Represented By: Daniel Ray Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole A. Legrottaglie
Represented By: Mark Steven Spring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Holdings Corporation
Represented By: Nicole A. Legrottaglie
Represented By: Mark Steven Spring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Corporation
Represented By: Nicole A. Legrottaglie
Represented By: Mark Steven Spring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comcast Cable Communications LLC
Represented By: Nicole A. Legrottaglie
Represented By: Mark Steven Spring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?