Bender v. Unum Group et al

Plaintiff: Ellen Bender
Defendant: Unum Group, Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company and Dave Jones As Commissioner of Insurance
Case Number: 3:2016cv03990
Filed: July 14, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO DISMISS ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/27/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2016)
September 28, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 10 Motion to Remand; granting 30 Administrative Motion to Permit Supplemental Declarations in Surreply. (pjhlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
July 22, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/20/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/27/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/22/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bender v. Unum Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Bender
Represented By: Terrence J. Coleman
Represented By: Ryan Hideki Opgenorth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Group
Represented By: Kristin Paige Kyle de Bautista
Represented By: Daniel William Maguire, Esq.
Represented By: Mark E Schmidtke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Kristin Paige Kyle de Bautista
Represented By: Daniel William Maguire, Esq.
Represented By: Mark E Schmidtke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Jones As Commissioner of Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?