Mendoza v. MV Transportation, Inc.

Plaintiff: Michael Mendoza
Defendant: MV Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv04005
Filed: July 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2017 48 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of MV Transportation, Inc. against Michael Mendoza. MV Transportation, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment is GRANTED, and Mendoza's motion for partial summary judgment is DENIED. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
June 1, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 29 33 Motions for summary judgment. Supplemental evidence from Plaintiff, if any, due by 06/08/17. Requests for hearing, if any, due by 06/09/17. Motion hearing previously set for 06/12/17 is vacated. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/01/17. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
October 24, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/24/16. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza v. MV Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Mendoza
Represented By: Richard M. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MV Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory G. Iskander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?