Californians for Alternatives to Toxics v. Kernen Construction Co. et al

Plaintiff: Californians for Alternatives to Toxics
Defendant: Kernen Construction Co., Bedrock Investments LLC, Scott Farley and Kurt Kernen
Case Number: 3:2016cv04007
Filed: July 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Referring Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 13, 2017 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 113 Motion to Approve Proposition 65 Settlement with AMENDED EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/13/17. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2017)
July 21, 2017 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 73 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Case Management Statement due by 8/7/2017. Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2017 at specially set time of 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2017)
May 3, 2017 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS re 91 . Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/3/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
February 3, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 50 Joint Discovery Letter Brief Re Dry and Wet Site Inspections filed by Bedrock Investments LLC, Kernen Construction Co., Kurt Kernen, Californians for Alternatives to Toxics, Scott Farley. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/3/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
January 4, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 31 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. (ygrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Californians for Alternatives to Toxics v. Kernen Construction Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Californians for Alternatives to Toxics
Represented By: William Nazar Carlon
Represented By: Andrew L. Packard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kernen Construction Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bedrock Investments LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Kernen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?