Perryment v. Sky Chefs, Inc.

Plaintiff: Linda Perryment
Defendant: Sky Chefs, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv04015
Filed: July 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Kandis A. Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/23/2017. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2017)
September 30, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying Defendant's 14 Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Defendant shall file an answer within 14 days of this order. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
September 28, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 18 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Linda Perryment filed by Linda Perryment, Sky Chefs, Inc., Case referred to mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 9/28/16. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
July 26, 2016 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER terminating 7 MOTION to Dismiss - Motion to Partially Dismiss the Complaint filed by Sky Chefs, Inc., in light of Plaintiff's 9 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint, which will be considered to be a first amended complaint since it was filed within 21 days of the motion to dismiss. Plaintiff shall immediately file a copy of the first amended complaint as a new docket entry. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 7/26/2016. (kawlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perryment v. Sky Chefs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Perryment
Represented By: Alan Harris
Represented By: Alan Dale Harris
Represented By: Priya Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sky Chefs, Inc.
Represented By: Natalja Marie Fulton
Represented By: Douglas G.A. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?