Crop Production Services, Inc. v. Greenberg et al

Plaintiff: Crop Production Services, Inc.
Defendant: Joey C. Greenberg and Nicholas Claussen
Case Number: 3:2016cv04020
Filed: July 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 29:1109
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2017 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING [re 69 Discovery Letter BriefRequest for Discovery Hearing filed by Nicholas Claussen, Joey C. Greenberg]. Response due by NOON on 5/8/2017. Two-hour meet-and-confer from 9:30 AM--11:30 AM 5/11/2017 in Court's jury room. Discovery Hearing set for 5/11/2017 11:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/3/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2017)
January 12, 2017 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE THIRD-PARTY WILBUR-ELLIS COMPANY'S 57 DISCOVERY LETTER DATED JANUARY 9, 2017 by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
January 3, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (pursuant to 54 stipulation) by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
November 7, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 35 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)
November 3, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 36 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ALEXIS LEE KIRKMAN PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
September 29, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 31 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2016)
August 16, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 20 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE AS TO MICHAEL J. HOFMANN.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2016)
August 11, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 16 APPLICATION FOR PRO HAC VICE AS TO MICHAEL J. HOFMANN.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
August 4, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 17 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
August 3, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/3/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crop Production Services, Inc. v. Greenberg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crop Production Services, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Alan Padway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey C. Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Claussen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?