Nand et al v. Specialized Portfolio Servicing Inc., et al

Plaintiff: Evelyn Nand and Sukhandra Nand
Defendant: Specialized Portfolio Servicing Inc. and National Default Servicing Corporation
Case Number: 3:2016cv04030
Filed: July 18, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court SIPULATION AND ORDER as to 20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and 51 to Continue Motion to Dismiss Hearing and Case Management Conference: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 2/16/2017 at 01:30 PM in Court room 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 2/9/2017. Motion Hearing re: 20 Motion to Dismiss reset for 2/16/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/20/2017. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
November 29, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 to Continue Hearing Dates and Briefing Schedules on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Responses due by 1/5/2017. Replies due by 1/12/2017. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Case Management Statement due by 1/19/2017. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/26/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/29/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
October 7, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER as to 20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Preliminary Injunction Hearing reset for 12/15/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/7/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2016)
August 19, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Motion for Preliminary Injunction and 20 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 10/13/2016. Replies due by 10/20/2016. Motion Hearing reset for 11/3/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/19/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
July 26, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 16 to Continue Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 8/30/2016. Replies due by 9/6/2016. Preliminary Injunction Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/26/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
July 19, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Parties to Contact ADR Department. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/19/2016. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
July 18, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 4 Ex Parte Application and to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction. Preliminary Injunction hearing will be heard on 8/4/2016 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor before the Honorable Judge Edward M. Chen. Responsive papers due 7/26/2016; Replies due 7/29/2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/18/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nand et al v. Specialized Portfolio Servicing Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Nand
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sukhandra Nand
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Portfolio Servicing Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Lakeith Hawkins
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Default Servicing Corporation
Represented By: Bryan Lakeith Hawkins
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?