Sheryl L McGowan et al v. Ford Motor Company

Plaintiff: Sheryl L. McGowan and Kirk McGowan
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 3:2016cv04054
Filed: July 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 8, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL (pursuant to 36 stipulation) by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2016)
November 16, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 31 JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/16/2016. Case Management Statement due by 12/1/2016 at noon. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/8/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 4, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 28 STIPULATION SELECTING ADR PROCESS by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
October 5, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 18 Clerk's Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/17/16. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheryl L McGowan et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl L. McGowan
Represented By: David Lawrence Herman
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Le Pere
Represented By: Hallen David Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk McGowan
Represented By: David Lawrence Herman
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Le Pere
Represented By: Hallen David Rosner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Amy Patricia Maclear, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?