Chaiwong v. Hanlees Fremont, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Weerachai Chaiwong
Defendant: Hanlees Fremont, Inc. and Ally Financial Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv04074
Filed: July 20, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 47 Stipulation to Extend Time for Ally Financial Inc. to File its Reply in Support of its 36 Motion to Dismiss the Cross Claims of Defendant Hanlees Fremont, Inc., Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(b). (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2016)
December 7, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 39 Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time for Hanlees Fremont, Inc. to Respond to Ally Financial, Inc.'s Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Cross-Claims, and to Extend Time for Ally's Reply Thereto. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2016)
October 13, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 31 Stipulation Continuing the Case Management Conference and Other Pending Deadlines. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaiwong v. Hanlees Fremont, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weerachai Chaiwong
Represented By: Joshua Charles Anaya
Represented By: Sharon Elizabeth Glassey
Represented By: Christopher T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanlees Fremont, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial Inc.
Represented By: Mary Catherine Kamka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?