SourceProse Corporation v. RPX Corporation

Plaintiff: Sourceprose Corporation
Defendant: RPX Corporation
Case Number: 3:2016cv04089
Filed: July 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 5, 2017 51 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion to Dismiss.The court grants in part and denies in part RPX's motion to dismiss. The court dismisses SourceProse's claim for breach of the NDA but grants leave to amend within 21 days of this order. The other two claims survive. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2017)
March 17, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO ENLARGE TIME TO FILE OPPOSITION AND REPLY TO MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 43 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Responses due by 4/6/2017. Replies due by 4/20/2017. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2017 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/17/2017. (rxmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2017)
January 26, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 28 Motion to Dismiss. The court grants RPX's motion to dismiss and dismisses SourceProse's contract claim (claim two), but the court grants leave to amend. The court also dismisses SourceProse's promissory-estoppel claim. SourceProse must file an amended complaint within fourteen days of this order. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SourceProse Corporation v. RPX Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RPX Corporation
Represented By: Adrian R. Ciechanowicz
Represented By: William P. Johnson
Represented By: Philip J. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sourceprose Corporation
Represented By: William B. Federman
Represented By: Robert S. Green
Represented By: James Robert Noblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?