Heng v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Petra Heng
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2016cv04136
Filed: July 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2017 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 27 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
October 5, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. STIPULATION AND ORDER re 15 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/5/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
August 8, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/8/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heng v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petra Heng
Represented By: Wesley Martin Lowe
Represented By: Edward Gerard Mannion
Represented By: Kelly Maureen Mannion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Linda Beth Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?