Salvan v. Toys 'R' US-Delaware, Inc.

Plaintiff: Marina Salvan
Defendant: Toys 'R' US-Delaware, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv04138
Filed: July 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Hearing Date for Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment filed by Toys 'R' Us-Delaware, Inc. Set/Reset Deadlines as to [43 ] MOTION for Summary Judgment and Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 6/1/2017. Replies due by 6/12/2017. Motion Hearing set for 7/27/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 18, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
March 23, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 36 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Toys 'R' Us-Delaware, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 23, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
October 31, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 17 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Selecting Private ADR by Marina Salvan filed by Marina Salvan. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 31, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2016).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salvan v. Toys 'R' US-Delaware, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marina Salvan
Represented By: Kristen Michelle Agnew
Represented By: Larry W Lee
Represented By: William Lucas Marder
Represented By: Nicholas Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toys 'R' US-Delaware, Inc.
Represented By: Karen Yoonjung Cho
Represented By: Mia Farber
Represented By: Adam Yuda Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?