Bolla v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC

Plaintiff: Charles Bolla
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv04142
Filed: July 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 17 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice.(rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
October 17, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/17/2016. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
July 27, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Referring Case to ADR Unit for Assessment Telephone Conference and Vacating Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/27/2016. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bolla v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Bolla
Represented By: Jeffery Percell Boykin
Represented By: Stephen Rawliegh Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Justin D. Balser
Represented By: Ashley Elizabeth Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?