Californians for Alternatives to Toxics v. Hilfiker Pipe Company et al

Plaintiff: Californians for Alternatives to Toxics
Defendant: Hilfiker Pipe Company, Harold K. Hilfiker and Kerry R. Glavich
Case Number: 3:2016cv04152
Filed: July 23, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 47 Stipulation to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 17, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2017)
December 29, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 STIPULATION TO EXTEND FED. R. CIV. P. 26(a) DOCUMENT DISCLOSURE AND SET SITE INSPECTION; filed by Hilfiker Pipe Company, Harold K. Hilfiker. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 29, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2016)
October 17, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSOCIATED DEADLINES re 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Hilfiker Pipe Company. Case Management Statement due by 11/21/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 17, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)
October 13, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 13 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation filed by Hilfiker Pipe Company. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 13, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Californians for Alternatives to Toxics v. Hilfiker Pipe Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Californians for Alternatives to Toxics
Represented By: William Nazar Carlon
Represented By: Andrew L. Packard
Represented By: William Leonard Verick
Represented By: David Hutching Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilfiker Pipe Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold K. Hilfiker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry R. Glavich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?