Gonzales v. City of San Jose, Police Dept. et al

Plaintiff: Isauro Gonzales
Defendant: City of San Jose, Police Dept., Asuelo Brian Anthony and Welch Ryan
Case Number: 3:2016cv04184
Filed: July 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: PSLC AGB
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 19 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Certificate of Service attached) (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2017)
April 5, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Welch Ryan, Le Vos, Asuelo Brian Anthony. Response due by 5/15/2017. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/5/17. (Certificate of Service Attached) (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2017)
November 3, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 10 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Certificate of Service Attached)(napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
August 11, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/11/16. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. City of San Jose, Police Dept. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isauro Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Jose, Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asuelo Brian Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Welch Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?