Exeter Finance Corp. v. Autocom Energy, LLC

Plaintiff: Exeter Finance Corp.
Defendant: Autocom Energy, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv04197
Filed: July 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT. This matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and any hearings scheduled in this matter are VACATED. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/01/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
October 25, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/3/2017. Case Management Conference reset for 1/17/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/25/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2016)
October 17, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES, AND ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 11/18/2016. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/17/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Exeter Finance Corp. v. Autocom Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exeter Finance Corp.
Represented By: Kate Elizabeth Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autocom Energy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?