Sparks-Magdaluyo v. New Penn Financial, LLC
Plaintiff: Phyllis Sparks-Magdaluyo
Defendant: New Penn Financial, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv04223
Filed: July 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/26/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018) Modified on 11/26/2018 (cl, COURT STAFF). The deputy clerk hereby certifies that on 11/26/18 a copy of this order was served by sending it via first-class mail to the address of each non-CM/ECF user listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing.
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED. Show Cause Response due by 11/16/2018. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/24/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 57 Motion for Leave to File. Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2018. Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sparks-Magdaluyo v. New Penn Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Sparks-Magdaluyo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Penn Financial, LLC
Represented By: Allan P Bareng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?