Zbitnoff v. Nationstar Deed of Trust, LLC

Plaintiff: Anna Zbitnoff
Defendant: Nationstar Deed of Trust, LLC and Citibank N.A.
Case Number: 3:2016cv04237
Filed: July 28, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/10/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
October 4, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Replies due by 10/25/2016. Responses due by 10/18/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/10/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2016 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/4/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2016)
August 31, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 36 LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2016)
August 11, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/11/2016. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zbitnoff v. Nationstar Deed of Trust, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Zbitnoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Deed of Trust, LLC
Represented By: Justin D. Balser
Represented By: Katalina Baumann
Represented By: Scott Benjamin Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank N.A.
Represented By: Justin D. Balser
Represented By: Katalina Baumann
Represented By: Scott Benjamin Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?