BNSF Railway Company, et al v. California State Board of Equalization, et al

Plaintiff: BNSF Railway Company and Union Pacific Railroad Company
Defendant: California State Board of Equalization, David J. Gau, George Runner, Fiona Ma, Jerome Horton, Diane L. Harkey, Betty T. Yee, Kamala D. Harris, California Governor's Office of Emergency Services and Mark Ghilarducci
Case Number: 3:2016cv04311
Filed: July 29, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2016 68 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Stay Of Proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/5/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2016)
November 15, 2016 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FORM OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/15/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
October 28, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 11 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2016)
August 18, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER [#28] Re: Briefing and Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Related Matters. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/18/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BNSF Railway Company, et al v. California State Board of Equalization, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: David Joseph Feder
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Horwich
Represented By: John Federick Muller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Raymond Atkins
Represented By: Hanna Chouest
Represented By: Melissa B. Hagan
Represented By: Tobias Loss-Eaton
Represented By: Carol Lynn Thompson
Represented By: Rebecca Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California State Board of Equalization
Represented By: Linda L. Berg
Represented By: Nicholas Clark Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David J. Gau
Represented By: Nicholas Clark Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Runner
Represented By: Nicholas Clark Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiona Ma
Represented By: Nicholas Clark Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerome Horton
Represented By: Nicholas Clark Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane L. Harkey
Represented By: Nicholas Clark Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty T. Yee
Represented By: Nicholas Clark Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala D. Harris
Represented By: Nicholas Clark Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Governor's Office of Emergency Services
Represented By: Nicholas Clark Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Ghilarducci
Represented By: Nicholas Clark Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?